Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 02/13/2021 at 21:10:42 (UTC).

MIRACLE CHIROPRACTIC & REHAB CENTER, LLC vs.MERASTAR INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 03/25/2020 MIRACLE CHIROPRACTIC REHAB CENTER, LLC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against MERASTAR INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Elizabeth J Starr. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************67-O

  • Filing Date:

    03/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Orange County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Orange County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Elizabeth J Starr

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MIRACLE CHIROPRACTIC & REHAB CENTER, LLC

KETTY DESHOMMES AKA

KETTY DESHOMMES AAO

Defendant

MERASTAR INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HANS KENNON

Defendant Attorney

JENNIFER BLACKMON

 

Court Documents

Voluntary Dismissal

Voluntary Dismissal

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF S DISCOVERY

Motion to Dismiss

Motion to Dismiss; Comments: by Merastar Insurance Company

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Notice of Service of Process/Return 69737507; Comments: MERASTAR INSURANCE COMPANY

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel 69810147; Comments: AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel 69811782; Comments: (DUPLICATE) AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

Not of App/Cancellation Small Claims PT Conf/Med

Not of App/Cancellation Small Claims PT Conf/Med 69879480; Comments: AND NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

Notice to Appear Scheduled

Notice to Appear Scheduled

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Complaint

Complaint

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVoluntary Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVoluntary Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF S DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Dismiss; Comments: by Merastar Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • HearingHearing: CANCELED-Cancelled Pre-Trial Civil; Location: Room 130.02 on the 1st Floor Pre-Trial Mediation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • DocketHEARING - CANCELED-Cancelled Pre-Trial Civil

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNot of App/Cancellation Small Claims PT Conf/Med; Comments: AND NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: (DUPLICATE) AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: MERASTAR INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice to Appear Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Hans Kennon; Amount: -310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Designation of Email Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MERASTAR INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where MIRACLE CHIROPRACTIC & REHAB CENTER, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Blackmon, Jennifer, ESQ