Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 02/11/2021 at 20:41:18 (UTC).

MILLENIA CHIROPRACTIC LLCvs.CENTURY NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 02/26/2020 MILLENIA CHIROPRACTIC LLCvs CENTURY NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY was filed as a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Tina L Caraballo. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************26-O

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Orange County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Orange County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Tina L Caraballo

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MILLENIA CHIROPRACTIC LLC

YENISEY DE LA FUENTE AAO

Defendants

PRO GENERAL INSURANCE

CENTURY NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ERIC DEMING

Defendant Attorney

BRET DUBBERT

 

Court Documents

Voluntary Dismissal

Voluntary Dismissal

Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

Response to Request to Produce

Response to Request to Produce

Response to Request for Admissions

Response to Request for Admissions

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address; Comments: OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESSES

Not of App/Cancellation Small Claims PT Conf/Med

Not of App/Cancellation Small Claims PT Conf/Med

Alias Notice to Appear Scheduled

Alias Notice to Appear Scheduled; Comments: EMAILED ATTY

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Amended Complaint

Amended Complaint

Order Granting Motion to Amend

Order Granting Motion to Amend; Comments: Complaint & Change Case Style

Notice to Appear Scheduled

Notice to Appear Scheduled; Comments: emailed to attorney

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Statement of Claim

Statement of Claim

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVoluntary Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVoluntary Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse to Request to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse to Request for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • HearingHearing: CANCELED-Cancelled Pre-Trial Civil; Location: Room 130.02 on the 1st Floor Pre-Trial Mediation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer & Affirmative Defenses; Comments: CENTURY-NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • DocketHEARING - CANCELED-Cancelled Pre-Trial Civil

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Designation of Email Address; Comments: OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNot of App/Cancellation Small Claims PT Conf/Med

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice to Appear Scheduled; Comments: emailed to attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Eric Deming; Amount: -310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Designation of Email Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Claim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MILLENIA CHIROPRACTIC, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Century National Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Dubbert, Bret E