Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 02/11/2021 at 19:41:17 (UTC).

MILLENIA CHIROPRACTIC LLCvs.ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 02/25/2020 MILLENIA CHIROPRACTIC LLCvs ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY was filed as a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Evellen H Jewett and Amy J Carter. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************68-O

  • Filing Date:

    02/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Orange County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Orange County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Evellen H Jewett

Amy J Carter

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MILLENIA CHIROPRACTIC LLC

MCKENZIE JOSEPH AAO

Defendant

ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ERIC DEMING

Defendant Attorney

PAULA MORRELL

 

Court Documents

Voluntary Dismissal

Voluntary Dismissal

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERY

Motion to Dismiss

Motion to Dismiss; Comments: PLAINTIFF S COMPLAINT - Defendant, ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Not of App/Cancellation Small Claims PT Conf/Med

Not of App/Cancellation Small Claims PT Conf/Med; Comments: AND DISCLOSURE DESIGNATION OF PRINCIPAL E-MAIL ADDRESS - Defendant(s), ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Notice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Notice to Appear Scheduled

Notice to Appear Scheduled; Comments: emailed to attorney

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Statement of Claim

Statement of Claim

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVoluntary Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVoluntary Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Dismiss; Comments: PLAINTIFF S COMPLAINT - Defendant, ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • HearingHearing: Pre-Trial Civil; Location: Room 130.02 on the 1st Floor Pre-Trial Mediation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • DocketHEARING - Pre-Trial Civil

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNot of App/Cancellation Small Claims PT Conf/Med; Comments: AND DISCLOSURE DESIGNATION OF PRINCIPAL E-MAIL ADDRESS - Defendant(s), ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice to Appear Scheduled; Comments: emailed to attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Eric Deming; Amount: -310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Designation of Email Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Claim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MILLENIA CHIROPRACTIC, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MORRELL PAULA