Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 01/15/2019 at 15:46:25 (UTC).

MILLENIA CHIROPRACTIC LLC vs. INFINITY AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 11/16/2018 MILLENIA CHIROPRACTIC LLC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against INFINITY AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Eric H DuBois. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************94-O

  • Filing Date:

    11/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Orange County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Orange County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Eric H DuBois

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MILLENIA CHIROPRACTIC LLC

COLLIN FRANKSON AKA

Defendant

INFINITY AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TODD LANDAU

Defendant Attorney

DENISE LUBLINER

 

Court Documents

Notice of Change of Address

Notice of Change of Address; Comments: OF FIRM

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Request to Produce

Request to Produce; Comments: REGARDING UNDERWRITING

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions; Comments: REGARDING FEE SCHEDULE

Not of App/Cancellation Small Claims PT Conf/Med

Not of App/Cancellation Small Claims PT Conf/Med

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Notice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: INFINITY AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY DONNA MOCH

Notice to Appear Scheduled

Notice to Appear Scheduled; Comments: email to atty

Statement of Claim

Statement of Claim

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/11/2019
  • HEARING - CANCELED-Cancelled Pre-Trial Civil

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Change of Address; Comments: OF FIRM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Designation of Email Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Service of Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Service of Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request to Produce; Comments: REGARDING UNDERWRITING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Admissions; Comments: REGARDING FEE SCHEDULE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Not of App/Cancellation Small Claims PT Conf/Med

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: INFINITY AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY DONNA MOCH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice to Appear Scheduled; Comments: email to atty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Statement of Claim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • Case Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • Description: Payment; Payer: Landau & Associates, P.A.; Amount: -185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • Description: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MILLENIA CHIROPRACTIC, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Infinity Auto Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DENISE P LUBLINER, ESQ