This case was last updated from Orange County Florida Courts on 03/12/2023 at 15:49:19 (UTC).

MILLENIA 700, LLCvs.DAVID AYON

Case Summary

On 01/11/2023 MILLENIA 700, LLCvs DAVID AYON was filed as a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Florida Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Eric H DuBois. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************76-O

  • Filing Date:

    01/11/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Eric H DuBois

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MILLENIA 700, LLC

MILLENIA 700 DBA

Defendant

DAVID AYON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ELIZABETH CRUIKSHANK

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Complaint

Complaint

Summons Issued 5 Day

Summons Issued 5 Day; Comments: emailed atty

Return of Service of Summons

Return of Service of Summons; Comments: DAVID AYON- POSTED

Certificate of Mailing

Certificate of Mailing

Certificate of Mailing

Certificate of Mailing; Comments: SENT VIA SASE

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing; Comments: SENT VIA SASE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service of Summons; Comments: DAVID AYON- POSTED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued 5 Day; Comments: emailed atty

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Cruikshank Ersin, LLC; Amount: -195.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 195.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketCase Initiated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less