This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 01/22/2022 at 16:21:06 (UTC).

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC.vs.ROSA ROSARIO

Case Summary

On 11/23/2021 MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ROSA ROSARIO. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Michael Deen and Eric H DuBois. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************58-O

  • Filing Date:

    11/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Michael Deen

Eric H DuBois

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC.

Defendant

ROSA ROSARIO

Orlando, FL 32822

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KRISTINA MOEHLE

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Notice of Confidential Information within Court Filing

Notice of Confidential Information within Court Filing

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Notice to Appear Scheduled

Notice to Appear Scheduled; Comments: emailed to attorney

Statement of Claim

Statement of Claim

Summons Returned Served

Summons Returned Served; Comments: Served 12/6/21 8:50 am

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/26/2022
  • HearingHearing: Pre-Trial Civil - Civil, Pretrial; Location: Video/Audio/Tele Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • DocketHEARING - Pre-Trial Civil - Civil, Pretrial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Returned Served; Comments: Served 12/6/21 8:50 am

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice to Appear Scheduled; Comments: emailed to attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Kristina B Moehle; Amount: -310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Confidential Information within Court Filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Claim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Midland Credit Management, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Moehle, Kristina B