Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 01/26/2019 at 15:38:17 (UTC).

MHC HIDDEN VALLEY LLC vs. DONNA H LITTLE, EARL LITTLE

Case Summary

On 11/27/2018 MHC HIDDEN VALLEY LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against DONNA H LITTLE, EARL LITTLE. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Faye L Allen. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************84-O

  • Filing Date:

    11/27/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Orange County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Orange County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Faye L Allen

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MHC HIDDEN VALLEY LLC

Defendants

DONNA H LITTLE

EARL LITTLE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STANLEY MARTIN

 

Court Documents

Final Judgment

Final Judgment

Entry of Default as to 5 Day

Entry of Default as to 5 Day

Motion for Final Judgment

Motion for Final Judgment; Comments: as to count I by MHC Hidden Valley LLC

Motion for Default

Motion for Default; Comments: as to count I against Donna H. Little

Affidavit of Non Military Service

Affidavit of Non Military Service

Certificate of Mailing

Certificate of Mailing; Comments: Donna

Certificate of Mailing

Certificate of Mailing; Comments: Earl

Affidavit of Service

Affidavit of Service; Comments: posted Donna H Little

Affidavit of Service

Affidavit of Service; Comments: posted Earl Little

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Complaint

Complaint

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Final Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Final Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Entry of Default as to 5 Day

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion for Final Judgment; Comments: as to count I by MHC Hidden Valley LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion for Default; Comments: as to count I against Donna H. Little

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Affidavit of Non Military Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Certificate of Mailing; Comments: Donna

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Certificate of Mailing; Comments: Earl

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Affidavit of Service; Comments: posted Donna H Little

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Affidavit of Service; Comments: posted Earl Little

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Issued Electronically as to

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Issued Electronically as to

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • Case Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • Description: Payment; Payer: Raquel Lebron; Amount: -205.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • Description: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 205.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Martin, Stanley L