This case was last updated from Orange County Florida Courts on 04/25/2023 at 15:49:00 (UTC).

MERCEDES BENZ FINANCIAL SERVICES USA LLCvs.SINGFIELD, SHAWNAEet al.

Case Summary

On 02/24/2023 MERCEDES BENZ FINANCIAL SERVICES USA LLCvs SINGFIELD, SHAWNAE was filed as a Property - Repossession lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Florida Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Brian Sandor. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************22-O

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Repossession

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Brian Sandor

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MERCEDES BENZ FINANCIAL SERVICES USA LLC

Defendants

SHAWNAE SINGFIELD

VO CHAI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PAUL WILSON

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Complaint

Complaint

Motion for Order

Motion for Order; Comments: directing the clerk of court to issue a writ of Replevin

Order for Writ

Order for Writ; Comments: of Replevin

Surety Bond Approved/Filed

Surety Bond Approved/Filed

Writ of Replevin Issued

Writ of Replevin Issued; Comments: Orig + copy returned to Paul Wilson Wilson Law Firm South Florida PA 10815 NW 12th CT Plantation , FL 33322 (FedEx 7913 4030 4190)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Replevin Issued; Comments: Orig + copy returned to Paul Wilson Wilson Law Firm South Florida PA 10815 NW 12th CT Plantation , FL 33322 (FedEx 7913 4030 4190)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: WILSON, PAUL EDWARD, JR, Esquire; Amount: -85.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: WILSON, PAUL EDWARD, JR, Esquire; Amount: -8.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 93.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • DocketFiling Fee; Comments: REPLEVIN FEE PAID

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • DocketBond Approval Fee Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSurety Bond Approved/Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder for Writ; Comments: of Replevin

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Order; Comments: directing the clerk of court to issue a writ of Replevin

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Wilson Law Firm Sout; Amount: -485.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 485.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • DocketCase Initiated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less