Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 04/15/2021 at 16:51:26 (UTC).

MEMORIAL HEALTH SYSTEMS INC vs. GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 03/22/2021 MEMORIAL HEALTH SYSTEMS INC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Brian F Duckworth. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************05-O

  • Filing Date:

    03/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Orange County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Orange County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Brian F Duckworth

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MEMORIAL HEALTH SYSTEMS INC

FRED BERGERON AAO

ADVENTHEALTH DAYTONA BEACH DBA

Defendant

GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BENJAMIN LOVING

 

Court Documents

Response to Request to Produce

Response to Request to Produce

Response to Request for Admissions

Response to Request for Admissions

Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: LAINTIFF S COMPLAINT AND DISCOVERY

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: DISCLOSURE, AND DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY E-MAIL ADDRESS

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Notice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EMAILED TO ATTY.

Addendum to

Addendum to; Comments: CIVIL COVER SHEET COUNTY COURT ADDENDUM.

Letter

Letter

Complaint

Complaint

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse to Request to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse to Request for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: LAINTIFF S COMPLAINT AND DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: DISCLOSURE, AND DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY E-MAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Designation of Email Address

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EMAILED TO ATTY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: BradfordCederberg, PA; Amount: -90.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 90.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAddendum to; Comments: CIVIL COVER SHEET COUNTY COURT ADDENDUM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLetter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Memorial Health Systems, Inc., 15cv192 is a litigant

Latest cases where GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LOVING, BENJAMIN