This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 03/05/2019 at 15:32:19 (UTC).

MELVIN, ROBERT vs. TRAVELERS COMMERCIAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 01/04/2019 MELVIN, ROBERT filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against TRAVELERS COMMERCIAL INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Chad K Alvaro. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************30-O

  • Filing Date:

    01/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Orange County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Orange County Circuit Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Chad K Alvaro

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ROBERT MELVIN

Defendant

TRAVELERS COMMERCIAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MICHAEL MANDEVILLE

Defendant Attorney

ALEXANDRA STEELE

 

Court Documents

Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

Response to Request to Produce

Response to Request to Produce

Request for Copies

Request for Copies; Comments: TO DEFENDANT, TRAVELERS COMMERCIAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Response to Request for Admissions

Response to Request for Admissions

Notice

Notice; Comments: OF DISCLOSURE

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Response to Request for Admissions

Response to Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Interrogatories

Interrogatories

Notice of Filing

Notice of Filing; Comments: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANT TRAVELERS COMMERCIAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed to atty

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Complaint

Complaint

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Response to Request to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Copies; Comments: TO DEFENDANT, TRAVELERS COMMERCIAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Response to Request for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice; Comments: OF DISCLOSURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Designation of Email Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer & Affirmative Defenses

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Response to Request for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed to atty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Designation of Email Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Service of Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • Case Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • Description: Payment; Payer: Michael Barszcz; Amount: -410.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • Description: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 410.00

    Read MoreRead Less