This case was last updated from Orange County Florida Courts on 09/17/2022 at 16:25:31 (UTC).

MEDVIEW IMAGING LLCvs.PROGRESSIVE ADVANCED INSURANCE COMPANY, PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY, PROGRESSIVE BAYSIDE INSURANCE COMPANY, PROGRESSIVE CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, PROGRESSIVE DIRECT INSURANCE COMPANY, PROGRESSIVE EXPRESS INSURANCE C

Case Summary

On 07/19/2022 MEDVIEW IMAGING LLCvs PROGRESSIVE ADVANCED INSURANCE COMPANY, PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY, PROGRESSIVE BAYSIDE INSURANCE COMPANY, PROGRESSIVE CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, PROGRESSIVE DIRECT INSURANCE COMPANY, PROGRESSIVE EXPRESS INSURANCE C was filed as a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Florida Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Elizabeth J Starr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************56-O

  • Filing Date:

    07/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Elizabeth J Starr

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MEDVIEW IMAGING LLC

STEPHANIE WELSH AAO

Defendants

PROGRESSIVE ADVANCED INSURANCE COMPANY

PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

PROGRESSIVE BAYSIDE INSURANCE COMPANY

PROGRESSIVE CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

PROGRESSIVE DIRECT INSURANCE COMPANY

PROGRESSIVE EXPRESS INSURANCE COMPANY

PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

PROGRESSIVE SOUTHEASTERN INSURANCE COMPANY

PROGRESSIVE SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHAD BARR

Defendant Attorney

WHITNEY DORT

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Statement of Claim

Statement of Claim

Interrogatories

Interrogatories

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Correspondence

Correspondence

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Addendum to

Addendum to

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed atty

Notice of Filing

Notice of Filing; Comments: OF PROCESS AND ORIGINAL SUMMONS

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Notice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: PROGRESSIVE ADVANCED INSURANCE COMPANY

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Motion to Dismiss

Motion to Dismiss; Comments: and/or Motion for More Definite Statement

Motion to Compel

Motion to Compel; Comments: APPEARANCE OF CORPORATE REPRESENTATIVE & ALTERNATIVELY MOTION TO STRIKE

Response to Request for Admissions

Response to Request for Admissions

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse to Request for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Compel; Comments: APPEARANCE OF CORPORATE REPRESENTATIVE & ALTERNATIVELY MOTION TO STRIKE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Dismiss; Comments: and/or Motion for More Definite Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: PROGRESSIVE ADVANCED INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing; Comments: OF PROCESS AND ORIGINAL SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed atty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Chad A. Barr; Amount: -75.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 75.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAddendum to

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Designation of Email Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCorrespondence

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInterrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Claim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PROGRESSIVE BAYSIDE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where PROGRESSIVE SOUTHEASTERN INSURANCE COMAPNY is a litigant

Latest cases where PROGRESSIVE ADVANCED INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where MEDVIEW IMAGING LLC is a litigant