This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 10/18/2020 at 03:50:09 (UTC).

MEDINA, MAGDA I vs. RIVERA MUNOS, SAUL

Case Summary

On 09/24/2020 MEDINA, MAGDA I filed a Family - Domestic Partnership Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against RIVERA MUNOS, SAUL. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Jeffrey L Ashton. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************49-O

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Domestic Partnership Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Orange County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Orange County Circuit Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Jeffrey L Ashton

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MAGDA I MEDINA

Respondent

SAUL RIVERA MUNOS

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/08/2020
  • DocketComprehensive Case History

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • DocketAffidavit of Service Returned Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • DocketComprehensive Case History

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • HearingHearing: Injunctions - Ashton, Jeffrey L (Actual: Latimore, Alicia L); Location: Room 16-B On The 16th Floor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketCourt Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketFinal Order Permanent Injunction Recorded

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketFinal Order of Injunction

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketHEARING - Injunctions - Ashton, Jeffrey L (Actual: Latimore, Alicia L)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketAffidavit of Service Returned Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketTemporary Order/Final Hearing Injunction

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketNotice of Related Cases

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketNotice of Social Security

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketWaiver

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketPetition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less