Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 02/11/2021 at 22:10:50 (UTC).

MAURICIO CHIROPRACTIC SOUTH LLC vs.PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 02/27/2020 MAURICIO CHIROPRACTIC SOUTH LLC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Evellen H Jewett and Amy J Carter. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************14-O

  • Filing Date:

    02/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Orange County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Orange County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Evellen H Jewett

Amy J Carter

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

VITALIE CIUGUREANU AAO

MAURICIO CHIROPRACTIC SOUTH LLC

Defendant

PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ERIC DEMING

Defendant Attorney

MICHELLE TANYHILL

 

Court Documents

Voluntary Dismissal

Voluntary Dismissal

Acceptance

Acceptance; Comments: OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: AND NOTICE OF E-MAIL DESIGNATION

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Notice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

Voluntary Dismissal

Voluntary Dismissal

Notice to Appear Scheduled

Notice to Appear Scheduled; Comments: emailed to attorney

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Statement of Claim

Statement of Claim

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVoluntary Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVoluntary Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAcceptance; Comments: OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • HearingHearing: Pre-Trial Civil; Location: Room 130.02 on the 1st Floor Pre-Trial Mediation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • DocketHEARING - Pre-Trial Civil

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: AND NOTICE OF E-MAIL DESIGNATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVoluntary Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVoluntary Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice to Appear Scheduled; Comments: emailed to attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Eric Deming; Amount: -310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Designation of Email Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Claim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MAURICIO CHIROPRACTIC SOUTH LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ERIC DEMING