This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 03/07/2023 at 12:05:37 (UTC).

MASON, DONALDet al. vs. STATE FARM FLORIDA INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 10/27/2022 MASON, DONALD filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against STATE FARM FLORIDA INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************57-O

  • Filing Date:

    10/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DONALD MASON

STEPHANIE MASON

Defendant

STATE FARM FLORIDA INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PAUL PERKINS

Defendant Attorney

STEVEN CRUMBLY

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Complaint

Complaint

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed atty

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Answer

Answer

Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

Notice of Filing

Notice of Filing; Comments: PRIVILEGE LOG

Response to Request to Produce

Response to Request to Produce; Comments: DEFENDANTS RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

Notice of Taking Deposition(s)

Notice of Taking Deposition(s)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Taking Deposition(s)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse to Request to Produce; Comments: DEFENDANTS RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing; Comments: PRIVILEGE LOG

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Designation of Email Address

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed atty

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: .; Amount: -410.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 410.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • DocketCase Initiated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less