This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 03/11/2021 at 22:16:35 (UTC).

MARTINEZ ORTIZ, HECTOR RAFAEL vs. BENAZAR, NEHIR

Case Summary

On 06/19/2020 MARTINEZ ORTIZ, HECTOR RAFAEL filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against BENAZAR, NEHIR. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Diana M. Tennis. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************46-O

  • Filing Date:

    06/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Diana M. Tennis

 

Party Details

Petitioner

HECTOR RAFAEL MARTINEZ ORTIZ

Respondent

NEHIR BENAZAR

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/08/2020
  • DocketOrder on Motion to Withdraw as Counsel

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • DocketOrder on Motion

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketConsent to Withdraw

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketMotion to Withdraw

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketMediation Report

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: MARTINEZ ORTIZ, HECTOR RAFAEL; Amount: -121.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 121.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketNotice of Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: BENAZAR, NEHIR; Amount: -121.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 121.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 06/19/2020
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • DocketFinancial Affidavit

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • DocketPetition

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • DocketNotice of Confidential Information within Court Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • DocketNotice of Related Cases

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • DocketNotice of Social Security

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • DocketDeclaration Under Uniform Child Custody Act

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • DocketCase Initiated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • DocketAmended Administrative Temporary Order Provided to Customer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less