This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 01/07/2019 at 15:31:34 (UTC).

MALIK, TAHIRet al. vs. SAHADEO, RAYAZet al.

Case Summary

On 11/08/2018 MALIK, TAHIR filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against SAHADEO, RAYAZ. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Keith A Carsten. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************77-O

  • Filing Date:

    11/08/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Orange County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Orange County Circuit Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Keith A Carsten

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

REHIMAN MALIK

TAHIR MALIK

Defendants

ALAYNA JAZMIN SAHADEO

RAYAZ SAHADEO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SCOTT LIOTTA

 

Court Documents

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Complaint

Complaint

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions; Comments: TO DEFENDANT, ALAYNA SAHADEO

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions; Comments: TO DEFENDANT, RAYAZ SAHADEO

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories; Comments: TO ALAYNA SAHADEO

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories; Comments: TO RAYAZ SAHADEO

Request to Produce

Request to Produce; Comments: TO ALAYNA SAHADEO

Request to Produce

Request to Produce; Comments: TO DEFENDANT, RAYAZ SAHADEO

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet; Comments: jury trial

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Service of Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer & Affirmative Defenses

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Issued Electronically as to

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Issued Electronically as to

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Admissions; Comments: TO DEFENDANT, ALAYNA SAHADEO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Admissions; Comments: TO DEFENDANT, RAYAZ SAHADEO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Service of Interrogatories; Comments: TO ALAYNA SAHADEO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Service of Interrogatories; Comments: TO RAYAZ SAHADEO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Request to Produce; Comments: TO ALAYNA SAHADEO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Request to Produce; Comments: TO DEFENDANT, RAYAZ SAHADEO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Cover Sheet; Comments: jury trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • Case Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • Description: Payment; Payer: Daniel J Newlin PA; Amount: -420.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • Description: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 420.00

    Read MoreRead Less