This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 10/18/2020 at 03:47:51 (UTC).

MAIR, ALBERT vs. FRANCIS, TRICHA

Case Summary

On 09/24/2020 MAIR, ALBERT filed a Family - Domestic Partnership Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against FRANCIS, TRICHA. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Jeffrey L Ashton. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************29-O

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Domestic Partnership Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Orange County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Orange County Circuit Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Jeffrey L Ashton

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ALBERT MAIR

Respondent

TRICHA FRANCIS

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/08/2020
  • HearingHearing: CANCELED-Cancelled Injunctions - Ashton, Jeffrey L; Location: Room 16-B On The 16th Floor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • DocketHEARING - CANCELED-Cancelled Injunctions - Ashton, Jeffrey L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • DocketOrder Dismissing Injunction Before Hearing Recorded

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • DocketOrder Dismissing Injunction Before Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketNotice of Voluntary Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketPetition or Motion for Modification

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketTemporary Order/Final Hearing Injunction

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketDeclaration Under Uniform Child Custody Act

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketNotice of Related Cases

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketNotice of Social Security

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketWaiver

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketPetition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less