This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 03/12/2023 at 15:36:25 (UTC).

M T BANK vs. STANDER, JAMES W, IIIet al.

Case Summary

On 01/11/2023 M T BANK filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against STANDER, JAMES W, III. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Vincent S. Chiu. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************20-O

  • Filing Date:

    01/11/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Vincent S. Chiu

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

M T BANK

Defendants

JAMES W STANDER III

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

UNKNOWN PARTY IN POSSESSION 1

UNKNOWN PARTY IN POSSESSION 2

CITIMORTGAGE INC

JAMES WILLIAM STANDER III AKA

SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT AKA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KATHRYN KASPER

Defendant Attorney

JOHN RUDY

 

Court Documents

Complaint

Complaint

Notice of Dropping Parties

Notice of Dropping Parties

Summons Returned Served

Summons Returned Served; Comments: AS TO UNKNONW PARTY IN POSSESSION 2 NKA KADEN STINNETT

Summons Returned Served

Summons Returned Served; Comments: AS TO UNKNOWN PARTIES IN POSSESSION NKA JENNIFER STINNETT

Summons Returned Unserved

Summons Returned Unserved; Comments: AS TO UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF JAMES W STANDER III AKA JAMES WILLIAM STANDER III

Summons Returned Served

Summons Returned Served; Comments: SERVED AS TO JAMES W STANDER III AKA JAMES WILLIAM STANDER III

Summons Returned Served

Summons Returned Served; Comments: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA OBO SEC OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT

Summons Returned Served

Summons Returned Served; Comments: CITIMORTGAGE, INC

Disclaimer

Disclaimer; Comments: Sent to Recording

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed atty

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed atty

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed atty

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed atty

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed atty

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed atty

Form "A"

Form "A"

Streamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Streamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Value of Real Property/Mortgage Foreclosure Claim Form

Value of Real Property/Mortgage Foreclosure Claim Form

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Dropping Party

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Dropping Parties

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Returned Served; Comments: AS TO UNKNONW PARTY IN POSSESSION 2 NKA KADEN STINNETT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Returned Served; Comments: AS TO UNKNOWN PARTIES IN POSSESSION NKA JENNIFER STINNETT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Returned Unserved; Comments: AS TO UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF JAMES W STANDER III AKA JAMES WILLIAM STANDER III

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Returned Served; Comments: SERVED AS TO JAMES W STANDER III AKA JAMES WILLIAM STANDER III

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Returned Served; Comments: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA OBO SEC OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Returned Served; Comments: CITIMORTGAGE, INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDisclaimer; Comments: Sent to Recording

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed atty

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed atty

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Tiffany and Bosco P.A.; Amount: -967.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 967.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketForm "A"

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStreamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketValue of Real Property/Mortgage Foreclosure Claim Form

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLis Pendens

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketCase Initiated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less