This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 01/06/2019 at 15:33:58 (UTC).

LOVELL, DIANA vs. BAYLES, PATRICK Let al.

Case Summary

On 11/07/2018 LOVELL, DIANA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against BAYLES, PATRICK L. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Bob LeBlanc and Lisa T Munyon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************44-O

  • Filing Date:

    11/07/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Orange County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Orange County Circuit Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Bob LeBlanc

Lisa T Munyon

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DIANA LOVELL

Defendants

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

PATRICK L BAYLES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WILLIAM MITCHELL

Defendant Attorneys

RICHARDS FORD

LYNEDA SHORTER

 

Court Documents

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories; Comments: TO DEFENDANT STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories; Comments: TO DEFENDANT, PATRICK L. BAYLES

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions; Comments: TO DEFENDANT, PATRICK L. BAYLES

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions; Comments: TO DEFENDANT STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Reply to Affirmative Defenses

Reply to Affirmative Defenses

Reply to Affirmative Defenses

Reply to Affirmative Defenses

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Notice

Notice; Comments: OF DISCLOSURE

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: AND DESIGNATION OF SERVICE EMAIL ADDRESS

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Summons Returned Served

Summons Returned Served; Comments: PATRICK L. BAYLES

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Reply to Affirmative Defenses

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Response to Request for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Reply to Affirmative Defenses

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Service of Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Request to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Response to Request for Admissions; Comments: DEFENDANT'S STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INS CO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer & Affirmative Defenses

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Designation of Email Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice; Comments: OF DISCLOSURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 11/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Request to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Request to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Admissions; Comments: TO DEFENDANT, PATRICK L. BAYLES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Admissions; Comments: TO DEFENDANT STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Designation of Email Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Cover Sheet; Comments: JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • Case Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • Description: Payment; Payer: MITCHELL, WILLIAM CLAY; Amount: -420.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • Description: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 420.00

    Read MoreRead Less