This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 03/03/2019 at 15:32:24 (UTC).

LOPEZ CANCEL, REINALDOet al. vs. SOUTHEASTERN SURVEYING AND MAPPING CORPORATIONet al.

Case Summary

On 01/02/2019 LOPEZ CANCEL, REINALDO filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against SOUTHEASTERN SURVEYING AND MAPPING CORPORATION. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Lisa T Munyon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************44-O

  • Filing Date:

    01/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    Orange County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Orange County Circuit Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Lisa T Munyon

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

REINALDO LOPEZ CANCEL

SHERRY LOPEZ

Defendants

DUKE ENERGY FLORIDA LLC

SOUTHEASTERN SURVEYING AND MAPPING CORPORATION

STAGE DOOR II INC

CENTURYLINK COMMUNICATIONS LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BEN WHITMAN

Defendant Attorneys

RAMON VAZQUEZ

GREGORY PRUSAK

 

Court Documents

Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

Notice of Propounding Interrogatories

Notice of Propounding Interrogatories

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Motion to Dismiss

Motion to Dismiss; Comments: COUNTS 1 AND 2 OF PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Motion to Dismiss

Motion to Dismiss; Comments: CENTURYLINK COMMUNICATIONS, LLC,

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Propounding Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Designation of Email Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion to Dismiss; Comments: COUNTS 1 AND 2 OF PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer & Affirmative Defenses

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Service of Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Service of Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 01/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Affidavit of Service; Comments: STAGE DOOR II, INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: E Mail Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: E Mail Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: E Mail Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: E Mail Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • Case Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • Description: Payment; Payer: Ben J. Whitman; Amount: -440.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • Description: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 440.00

    Read MoreRead Less