This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 11/22/2020 at 16:09:30 (UTC).

LEESBURG REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, INC. vs. PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 LEESBURG REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, INC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Elizabeth J Starr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************82-O

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Orange County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Orange County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Elizabeth J Starr

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LEESBURG REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER

ETHEL BLUE AAO

LEESBURG REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, INC.

Defendant

PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHAD BARR

Defendant Attorney

TIFFANY COLBERT

 

Court Documents

Reply to Affirmative Defenses

Reply to Affirmative Defenses; Comments: PLAINTIFF S REPLY TO DEFENDANT S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Answer & Affirmative Defenses; Comments: PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Response to Request for Admissions

Response to Request for Admissions

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Notice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories; Comments: (First)

Summons Issued

Summons Issued; Comments: emailed to attorney

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet; Comments: Addendum

Letter

Letter; Comments: Re: Deposition

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions; Comments: (First)

Request to Produce

Request to Produce; Comments: (First)

Statement of Claim

Statement of Claim

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReply to Affirmative Defenses; Comments: PLAINTIFF S REPLY TO DEFENDANT S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer & Affirmative Defenses; Comments: PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse to Request for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued; Comments: emailed to attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Chad Barr; Amount: -65.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 65.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet; Comments: Addendum

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLetter; Comments: Re: Deposition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions; Comments: (First)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories; Comments: (First)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce; Comments: (First)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Claim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less