This case was last updated from Orange County Florida Courts on 09/03/2022 at 16:54:40 (UTC).

LEESBURG REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER INCvs.PROGRESSIVE ADVANCED INSURANCE COMPANY, PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY, PROGRESSIVE BAYSIDE INSURANCE COMPANY, PROGRESSIVE CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, PROGRESSIVE DIRECT INSURANCE COMPANY, PROGRESSIVE EX

Case Summary

On 08/10/2022 LEESBURG REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER INCvs PROGRESSIVE ADVANCED INSURANCE COMPANY, PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY, PROGRESSIVE BAYSIDE INSURANCE COMPANY, PROGRESSIVE CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, PROGRESSIVE DIRECT INSURANCE COMPANY, PROGRESSIVE EX was filed as a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Florida Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Amy J Carter. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************20-O

  • Filing Date:

    08/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Amy J Carter

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LEESBURG REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER INC

MATTHEW DEMPSEY AAO

Defendants

PROGRESSIVE ADVANCED INSURANCE COMPANY

PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

PROGRESSIVE BAYSIDE INSURANCE COMPANY

PROGRESSIVE CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

PROGRESSIVE DIRECT INSURANCE COMPANY

PROGRESSIVE EXPRESS INSURANCE COMPANY

PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

PROGRESSIVE SOUTHEASTERN INSURANCE COMPANY

PROGRESSIVE SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WILLIAM ENGLAND

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Statement of Claim

Statement of Claim

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet; Comments: ADDENDUM

Correspondence

Correspondence

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions; Comments: TO DEFT

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories; Comments: TO DEFT

Request to Produce

Request to Produce; Comments: TO DEFT

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EMAILED TO ATTY

Notice of Filing

Notice of Filing; Comments: PROCESS AND ORIGINAL SUMMONS

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Notice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: PROGRESSIVE ADVANCED INSURANCE COMPANY

Voluntary Dismissal

Voluntary Dismissal

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/30/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVoluntary Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: PROGRESSIVE ADVANCED INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing; Comments: PROCESS AND ORIGINAL SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EMAILED TO ATTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Chad A. Barr; Amount: -75.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 75.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce; Comments: TO DEFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories; Comments: TO DEFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions; Comments: TO DEFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCorrespondence

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet; Comments: ADDENDUM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Claim

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketCase Initiated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PROGRESSIVE BAYSIDE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where PROGRESSIVE SOUTHEASTERN INSURANCE COMAPNY is a litigant

Latest cases where LEESBURG REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER is a litigant