This case was last updated from Orange County Florida Courts on 03/05/2023 at 18:12:19 (UTC).

LATONIA DANIELSvs.CAPIO PARTNERS LLC, ANESTHESIOLOGISTS OF GREATER ORLANDO INC

Case Summary

On 08/24/2022 LATONIA DANIELSvs CAPIO PARTNERS LLC, ANESTHESIOLOGISTS OF GREATER ORLANDO INC was filed as a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Florida Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Andrew Bain. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************10-O

  • Filing Date:

    08/24/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Andrew Bain

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LATONIA DANIELS

Defendants

CAPIO PARTNERS LLC

ANESTHESIOLOGISTS OF GREATER ORLANDO INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SEAN MCCORMACK

 

Court Documents

Returned Mail

Returned Mail

Order Approving Settlement

Order Approving Settlement; Comments: and Dismissing Case

Joint Stipulation for Dismissal

Joint Stipulation for Dismissal

Order Approving Settlement

Order Approving Settlement; Comments: and Dismissing case

Notice

Notice; Comments: OF RESOLUTION

Order Following Pre-Trial Conference

Order Following Pre-Trial Conference

Minutes Hearing

Minutes Hearing

Notice of Settlement

Notice of Settlement

Notice of Filing

Notice of Filing

Notice of Filing

Notice of Filing

Statement of Claim

Statement of Claim

Notice to Appear Scheduled

Notice to Appear Scheduled; Comments: EM ATTY

Notice to Appear Scheduled

Notice to Appear Scheduled; Comments: EM ATTY

Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturned Mail

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Approving Settlement and/or Stipulation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Approving Settlement; Comments: and Dismissing Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJoint Stipulation of Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJoint Stipulation for Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Approving Settlement and/or Stipulation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Approving Settlement; Comments: and Dismissing case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • HearingHearing: Pre-Trial Civil - Bain, Andrew (Actual: Civil, Pretrial); Location: Video/Audio/Tele Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • HearingHearing: Pre-Trial Civil - Civil, Pretrial (Actual: Civil, Pretrial); Location: Video/Audio/Tele Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice; Comments: OF RESOLUTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 08/24/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Sean P. McCormack; Amount: -195.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 195.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Claim

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • DocketCase Initiated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less