This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 03/08/2023 at 19:34:45 (UTC).

LASEIT HAIR REMOVAL CORPvs.CAPACITY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 12/02/2022 LASEIT HAIR REMOVAL CORPvs CAPACITY INSURANCE COMPANY was filed as a Contract - Insurance lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Vincent S. Chiu. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************10-O

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Vincent S. Chiu

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LASEIT HAIR REMOVAL CORP

Defendant

CAPACITY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DEAN MAKRIS

Defendant Attorney

ERNEST MYERS

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Complaint

Complaint; Comments: AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: em atty

Notice of Filing

Notice of Filing; Comments: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS / DEFENDANT, CAPACITY INSURANCE COMPANY

Exhibits in Support of

Exhibits in Support of; Comments: A

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Reply to Affirmative Defenses

Reply to Affirmative Defenses

Response to Request to Produce

Response to Request to Produce

Objection

Objection

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketObjection

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse to Request to Produce

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReply to Affirmative Defenses

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer & Affirmative Defenses

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketExhibits in Support of; Comments: A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing; Comments: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS / DEFENDANT, CAPACITY INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: em atty

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Makris Mullinax PA; Amount: -410.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 410.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint; Comments: AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketCase Initiated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less