This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 11/06/2021 at 17:04:48 (UTC).

LAS CRUCES MEDICAL CENTER LLCvs.MARITONI MANGUNE

Case Summary

On 10/13/2021 LAS CRUCES MEDICAL CENTER LLCvs MARITONI MANGUNE was filed as a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Brian F Duckworth. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************22-O

  • Filing Date:

    10/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Brian F Duckworth

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LAS CRUCES MEDICAL CENTER LLC

MOUNTAINVIEW REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER AKA

Defendant

MARITONI MANGUNE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TROY LOTANE

 

Court Documents

Summons Returned Served

Summons Returned Served; Comments: Served 10/119/21 12:34 PM Maritoni Mangune

Notice to Appear Scheduled

Notice to Appear Scheduled; Comments: Emailed Atty

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Statement of Claim

Statement of Claim

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/16/2021
  • HearingHearing: Pre-Trial Civil - Caraballo, Tina L; Location: Video/Audio/Tele Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketHEARING - Pre-Trial Civil - Caraballo, Tina L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Returned Served; Comments: Served 10/119/21 12:34 PM Maritoni Mangune

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice to Appear Scheduled; Comments: Emailed Atty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketNotice to Appear Scheduled; Comments: Emailed ATty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Troy Lotane one; Amount: -310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Claim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lotane, Troy R