This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 07/11/2018 at 13:27:50 (UTC).

LANDMARK REALESTATE HOLDING LLC vs. CHRISTOPHER SPENCER

Case Summary

On 11/20/2017 LANDMARK REALESTATE HOLDING LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against CHRISTOPHER SPENCER. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is David P Johnson. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************74-O

  • Filing Date:

    11/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

David P Johnson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LANDMARK REALESTATE HOLDING LLC

Defendant

CHRISTOPHER SPENCER

 

Court Documents

Writ of Possession Returned Posted

Writ of Possession Returned Posted

Writ of Possession Issued

Writ of Possession Issued; Comments: original and copy handed to plaintiff

Final Judgment

Final Judgment

Motion for Final Judgment

Motion for Final Judgment

Motion and Entry of Clerk Default

Motion and Entry of Clerk Default

Owners Authorization

Owners Authorization

Summons Returned Posted

Summons Returned Posted

Certificate of Mailing

Certificate of Mailing

Summons Issued 5 Day

Summons Issued 5 Day; Comments: emailed to pltf

Exhibit(s)

Exhibit(s); Comments: Three Day Notice to Tenant for Payment

Exhibit(s)

Exhibit(s); Comments: Residential Lease Agreement

Affidavit of Non Military Service

Affidavit of Non Military Service

Complaint

Complaint

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Writ of Possession Returned Posted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Final Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Writ of Possession Issued; Comments: original and copy handed to plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Final Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion for Final Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion and Entry of Clerk Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Owners Authorization

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Returned Posted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Certificate of Mailing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Issued 5 Day; Comments: emailed to pltf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Exhibit(s); Comments: Three Day Notice to Tenant for Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Exhibit(s); Comments: Residential Lease Agreement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Affidavit of Non Military Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2017
  • Case Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2017
  • Description: Payment; Payer: Milestone Properties; Amount: -195.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2017
  • Description: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 195.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LANDMARK REALESTATE HOLDINGS LLC is a litigant