This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 12/31/2018 at 15:42:36 (UTC).

LAKE MARY SPINE AND REHABILITATION CENTER PLLC vs. STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 11/01/2018 LAKE MARY SPINE AND REHABILITATION CENTER PLLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Eric H DuBois. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************82-O

  • Filing Date:

    11/01/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Orange County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Orange County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Eric H DuBois

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LAKE MARY SPINE AND REHABILITATION CENTER PLLC

AMBER ROBINSON AAO

SPINE AND REHABILITATION CENTERS DBA

Defendant

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MICHAEL BREHNE

JAMES GENTRY

Defendant Attorney

E CHILDS

 

Court Documents

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice of Filing

Notice of Filing; Comments: ORDER GRANTING PETITIONS FOR CERTIORARI

Notice of Filing

Notice of Filing; Comments: MOTION FOR EXPEDITED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IN LEAD CASE

Notice of Filing

Notice of Filing; Comments: AFFIDAVITS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISQUALIFY

Notice of Filing

Notice of Filing; Comments: AFFIDAVITS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISQUALIFY PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL

Motion for Protective Order

Motion for Protective Order; Comments: AS TO THE DEPOSITIONS OF VICTORIA ARMSTRONG, SCOTT DUTTON, JUSTIN SEEKAMP, ZEA McDONNOUGH, LARA GAFFNEY, JOHN MORROW, AND MATT CORKER

Motion to Stay

Motion to Stay; Comments: PENDING RESOLUTION OF DEFENDANT S MOTION TO DISQUALIFY PLAINTIFF S COUNSEL

Motion to Consolidate

Motion to Consolidate

Motion to Disqualify or Recuse

Motion to Disqualify or Recuse; Comments: COUNSEL AND MOTION FOR EVIDENTIARY HEARING

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Not of App/Cancellation Small Claims PT Conf/Med

Not of App/Cancellation Small Claims PT Conf/Med

Notice of Filing

Notice of Filing; Comments: notice of service of process

Notice to Appear

Notice to Appear; Comments: emailed to atty

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/14/2018
  • HEARING - CANCELED-Cancelled Pre-Trial Civil

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice Appearance of Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Filing; Comments: ORDER GRANTING PETITIONS FOR CERTIORARI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Filing; Comments: MOTION FOR EXPEDITED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IN LEAD CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Filing; Comments: AFFIDAVITS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISQUALIFY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Filing; Comments: AFFIDAVITS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISQUALIFY PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion for Protective Order; Comments: AS TO THE DEPOSITIONS OF VICTORIA ARMSTRONG, SCOTT DUTTON, JUSTIN SEEKAMP, ZEA McDONNOUGH, LARA GAFFNEY, JOHN MORROW, AND MATT CORKER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion to Stay; Comments: PENDING RESOLUTION OF DEFENDANT S MOTION TO DISQUALIFY PLAINTIFF S COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion to Consolidate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion to Disqualify or Recuse; Comments: COUNSEL AND MOTION FOR EVIDENTIARY HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 11/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice to Appear; Comments: emailed to atty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Designation of Email Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Service of Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Request to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • Case Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • Description: Payment; Payer: Michael B Brehne; Amount: -90.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • Description: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 90.00

    Read MoreRead Less