Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 03/04/2019 at 16:01:39 (UTC).

LAKE MARY SPINE AND REHABILITATION CENTER PLLC vs. PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 01/03/2019 LAKE MARY SPINE AND REHABILITATION CENTER PLLC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Faye L Allen. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************10-O

  • Filing Date:

    01/03/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Orange County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Orange County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Faye L Allen

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LAKE MARY SPINE AND REHABILITATION CENTER PLLC

PERSIO PEREZ AKA

SPINE AND REHABILITATION CENTERS DBA

PERSIO PEREZ AAO

Defendant

PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MICHAEL BREHNE

Defendant Attorneys

MICHAEL HAMMOND

BRIDGET BULLIS

 

Court Documents

Response to Request for Admissions

Response to Request for Admissions

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES PURSUANT TO RULE 2.516

Not of App/Cancellation Small Claims PT Conf/Med

Not of App/Cancellation Small Claims PT Conf/Med; Comments: AND NOTICE OF E-MAIL DESIGNATION scheduled for February 15, 2019, be cancelled.

Notice of Filing

Notice of Filing; Comments: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS IN THE ABOVE CAUSE.

Notice to Appear Scheduled

Notice to Appear Scheduled; Comments: Emailed to Atty

Complaint

Complaint

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Response to Request for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • HEARING - CANCELED-Cancelled Pre-Trial Civil

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES PURSUANT TO RULE 2.516

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Not of App/Cancellation Small Claims PT Conf/Med; Comments: AND NOTICE OF E-MAIL DESIGNATION scheduled for February 15, 2019, be cancelled.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Filing; Comments: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS IN THE ABOVE CAUSE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice to Appear Scheduled; Comments: Emailed to Atty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Designation of Email Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Service of Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • Case Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • Description: Payment; Payer: Michael B. Brehne Esq; Amount: -185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • Description: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SPINE & REHABILITATION CENTERS DBA is a litigant

Latest cases where Lake Mary Spine and Rehabilitation Center PLLC is a litigant

Latest cases where PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MICHAEL BREHNE