This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 03/05/2023 at 17:54:51 (UTC).

KOLADIYIL, ANOOP JOSE et al. vs. KB HOME et al.

Case Summary

On 08/24/2022 KOLADIYIL, ANOOP JOSE filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against KB HOME. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************82-O

  • Filing Date:

    08/24/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ANOOP JOSE KOLADIYIL

REMYA JOSE KOLLAMPARAMPIL

Defendants and 3Rd Party Plaintiffs

KB HOME

KB HOME FLORIDA LLC

KB HOME ORLANDO LLC

3Rd Party Defendants

A&B STUCCO, INC.

SUPERIOR COATING SYSTEMS, INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NEIL O'BRIEN

Defendant and 3Rd Party Plaintiff Attorney

DANA CHAABAN

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Complaint

Complaint; Comments: AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EMAIL ATTORNEY

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EMAIL ATTORNEY

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EMAIL ATTORNEY

Return of Service of Summons

Return of Service of Summons; Comments: served kb home florida llc 9/1/22

Return of Service of Summons

Return of Service of Summons; Comments: served kb home orlando llc 9/1/22

Return of Service of Summons

Return of Service of Summons; Comments: KB HOME

Answer & Third Party Complaint/Petition

Answer & Third Party Complaint/Petition; Comments: AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

Third Party Summons Issued

Third Party Summons Issued; Comments: Emailed Issued Third Party Summon to the Attorney

Third Party Summons Issued

Third Party Summons Issued; Comments: Emailed Issued Third Party Summon to the Attorney

Summons Returned Served

Summons Returned Served; Comments: A & B STUCCO INC

Return of Service of Summons

Return of Service of Summons; Comments: Served-Superior Coating Systems Inc

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service of Summons; Comments: Served-Superior Coating Systems Inc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Returned Served; Comments: A & B STUCCO INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketThird Party Summons Issued; Comments: Emailed Issued Third Party Summon to the Attorney

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketThird Party Summons Issued; Comments: Emailed Issued Third Party Summon to the Attorney

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: CHAABAN, DANA; Amount: -415.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 415.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer & Third Party Complaint/Petition; Comments: AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service of Summons; Comments: KB HOME

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service of Summons; Comments: served kb home orlando llc 9/1/22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service of Summons; Comments: served kb home florida llc 9/1/22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EMAIL ATTORNEY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EMAIL ATTORNEY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EMAIL ATTORNEY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Neil O'Brien; Amount: -430.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 430.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint; Comments: AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • DocketCase Initiated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less