This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 02/03/2019 at 15:33:15 (UTC).

KIRKLAND, SPENCER D vs. CENTENO, EMANUEL Ret al.

Case Summary

On 12/05/2018 KIRKLAND, SPENCER D filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CENTENO, EMANUEL R. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Kevin B. Weiss. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************90-O

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Orange County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Orange County Circuit Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Kevin B. Weiss

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SPENCER D KIRKLAND

Defendants

UNIVERSAL STUDIOS AKA

UNIVERSAL CITY DEVELOPMENT PARTNERS LTD

EMANUEL R CENTENO

UNIVERSAL STUDIOS DBA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KATHRYN ANDERSON

Defendant Attorney

JESSICA KENNEDY

 

Court Documents

Summons Returned Served

Summons Returned Served; Comments: EMANUEL R. CENTENO

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Answer & Affirmative Defenses; Comments: DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Interrogatories

Interrogatories

Interrogatories

Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Complaint

Complaint

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Returned Served; Comments: EMANUEL R. CENTENO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Request to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Service of Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer & Affirmative Defenses; Comments: DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Issued Electronically as to

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Issued Electronically as to

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Request to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Request to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Service of Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Service of Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • Case Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • Description: Payment; Payer: ANDERSON, KATHRYN DENISE; Amount: -420.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • Description: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 420.00

    Read MoreRead Less