This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 02/24/2021 at 22:30:03 (UTC).

KIRHNER, VICTORIA vs. PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANYet al.

Case Summary

On 09/28/2020 KIRHNER, VICTORIA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Chad K Alvaro and Vincent Falcone. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************86-O

  • Filing Date:

    09/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Chad K Alvaro

Vincent Falcone

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VICTORIA KIRHNER

Defendants

ANDRE CHARLES WOODS

PAUL A LAGANA

PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

AMERICAN FURNITURE RENTALS INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MARK AHRENS

Defendant Attorneys

ALFRED SUAREZ

TODD BOHNENSTIEHL

THOMAS SLAUGHTER

 

Court Documents

Response to Request to Produce

Response to Request to Produce

Response to Request to Produce

Response to Request to Produce

Request for Copies

Request for Copies

Request for Copies

Request for Copies

Notice of Production of Non-Party

Notice of Production of Non-Party

Notice of Service of Proposal for Settlement

Notice of Service of Proposal for Settlement

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions; Comments: TO DEFENDANT PROGRESSIVE SELECT INS CO

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions; Comments: TO DEFENDANT ANDRE CHARLES WOODS

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions; Comments: TO DEFENDANT AMERICAN FURNITURE RENTALS INC

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories; Comments: TO DEFENDANT AMERICAN FURNITURE RENTALS INC

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories; Comments: TO DEFENDANT PAUL A LAGANA

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories; Comments: TO DEFENDANT ANDRE CHARLES WOODS

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories; Comments: TO DEFENDANT PROGRESSIVE SELECT INS CO

Complaint

Complaint

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

52 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse to Request to Produce

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse to Request to Produce

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Copies

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Copies

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Production of Non-Party

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Proposal for Settlement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse to Request to Produce

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
47 More Docket Entries
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions; Comments: TO DEFENDANT PROGRESSIVE SELECT INS CO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions; Comments: TO DEFENDANT ANDRE CHARLES WOODS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions; Comments: TO DEFENDANT AMERICAN FURNITURE RENTALS INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories; Comments: TO DEFENDANT AMERICAN FURNITURE RENTALS INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories; Comments: TO DEFENDANT PAUL A LAGANA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories; Comments: TO DEFENDANT ANDRE CHARLES WOODS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories; Comments: TO DEFENDANT PROGRESSIVE SELECT INS CO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketCase Initiated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less