This case was last updated from Orange County Florida Courts on 03/12/2023 at 16:00:19 (UTC).

KIM CHIROPRACTIC CLINIC, P.A. vs. GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 01/11/2023 KIM CHIROPRACTIC CLINIC, P A filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Orange County Florida Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Evellen H Jewett. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************55-O

  • Filing Date:

    01/11/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Evellen H Jewett

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

KIM CHIROPRACTIC CLINIC, P.A.

SHANICE WRIGHT AAO

Defendant

GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JESSICA PICKERAL

Defendant Attorney

DOMENICO TIRADO

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Complaint

Complaint

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories; Comments: TO DEFENDANT

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Request to Produce

Request to Produce; Comments: TO DEFENDANT

Notice of Compliance

Notice of Compliance; Comments: AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES)

Addendum to

Addendum to

Streamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Streamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed atty

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Notice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: ELECTRONIC DELIVERY on Thursday, January 19, 2023 GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANTS DISCOVERY

Answer

Answer

Response to Request for Admissions

Response to Request for Admissions

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse to Request for Admissions

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANTS DISCOVERY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: ELECTRONIC DELIVERY on Thursday, January 19, 2023 GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed atty

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Jessica Pickeral; Amount: -310.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 310.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStreamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAddendum to

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Compliance; Comments: AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce; Comments: TO DEFENDANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories; Comments: TO DEFENDANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketCase Initiated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less