This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 01/23/2022 at 16:15:40 (UTC).

JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.vs.STACIE REID

Case Summary

On 11/24/2021 JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N A filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against STACIE REID. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Elizabeth J Starr. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************43-O

  • Filing Date:

    11/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Elizabeth J Starr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.

Defendant

STACIE REID

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KRISTINA MOEHLE

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Complaint

Complaint

Notice of Confidential Information within Court Filing

Notice of Confidential Information within Court Filing

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Notice to Appear Scheduled

Notice to Appear Scheduled; Comments: Emailed to atty.

Complaint

Complaint

Motion

Motion; Comments: TO ADOPT SETTLEMENT STIPULATION

Order Approving Settlement

Order Approving Settlement; Comments: & Order of Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/27/2022
  • HearingHearing: CANCELED-Cancelled Pre-Trial Civil - Civil, Pretrial; Location: Video/Audio/Tele Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • DocketHEARING - CANCELED-Cancelled Pre-Trial Civil - Civil, Pretrial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Approving Settlement and/or Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Approving Settlement; Comments: & Order of Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion; Comments: TO ADOPT SETTLEMENT STIPULATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice to Appear Scheduled; Comments: Emailed to atty.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Kristina B Moehle; Amount: -310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Confidential Information within Court Filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JPMorgan Chase Bank NA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Moehle, Kristina B