Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 05/18/2021 at 19:06:56 (UTC).

JOSEPH W SLATTERY MD PA vs. UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION

Case Summary

On 03/19/2021 JOSEPH W SLATTERY MD PA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Brian F Duckworth. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************74-O

  • Filing Date:

    03/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Orange County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Orange County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Brian F Duckworth

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JOSEPH W SLATTERY MD PA

MARIA KINSER AAO

INJURY CARE CLINIC DBA

Defendants

UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION

USAA AKA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GREGORY GUDIN

Defendant Attorney

KATY MELCHIORRE

 

Court Documents

Notice of Service

Notice of Service; Comments: UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Answer & Affirmative Defenses; Comments: AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

Notice of Lien

Notice of Lien; Comments: FOR ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EMAILED TO ATTY.

Addendum to

Addendum to; Comments: CIVIL COVER SHEET COUNTY COURT ADDENDUM.

Statement of Claim

Statement of Claim

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service; Comments: UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer & Affirmative Defenses; Comments: AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Lien; Comments: Sent Via E-Rec

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EMAILED TO ATTY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Marc Salpeter; Amount: -90.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 90.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAddendum to; Comments: CIVIL COVER SHEET COUNTY COURT ADDENDUM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Claim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where USAA AKA is a litigant

Latest cases where INJURY CARE CLINIC DBA is a litigant

Latest cases where United Services Automobile Association is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gudin, Gregory E, ESQ.