This case was last updated from Orange County Florida Courts on 08/06/2022 at 06:29:30 (UTC).

JOSEPH W. SLATTERY, M.D., P.A. vs. PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 05/18/2022 JOSEPH W SLATTERY, M D , P A filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Orange County Florida Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Brian Sandor. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************42-O

  • Filing Date:

    05/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Brian Sandor

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JOSEPH W. SLATTERY, M.D., P.A.

KELLROY GORDON AAO

INJURY CARE CLINIC DBA

Defendant

PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ERIC DEMING

Defendant Attorney

TIFFANY COLBERT

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Complaint

Complaint

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories; Comments: TO DEFT

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions; Comments: TO DEFT

Request to Produce

Request to Produce; Comments: TO DEFT

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet; Comments: ADDENDUM

Streamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Streamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EMAILED TO ATTY

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address; Comments: PLTF NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 2.516

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Notice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Response to Request for Admissions

Response to Request for Admissions

Response to Request to Produce

Response to Request to Produce

Privilege Log

Privilege Log

Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPrivilege Log

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse to Request to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse to Request for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer & Affirmative Defenses

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EMAILED TO ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Eric W Deming; Amount: -310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStreamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet; Comments: ADDENDUM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Designation of Email Address; Comments: PLTF NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 2.516

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce; Comments: TO DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions; Comments: TO DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories; Comments: TO DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where INJURY CARE CLINIC DBA is a litigant

Latest cases where Progressive American Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer COLBERT TIFFANY V