This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 02/09/2019 at 15:38:55 (UTC).

FAIRWAY COLLECTIONS LLC vs. ALLIED PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, NATIONWIDE INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA

Case Summary

On 12/11/2018 FAIRWAY COLLECTIONS LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ALLIED PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, NATIONWIDE INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Faye L Allen. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************24-O

  • Filing Date:

    12/11/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Orange County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Orange County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Faye L Allen

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JONALISA INC

SUPERIOR HEATING AND COOLING AKA

SUPERIOR HEATING AND COOLING AAO

JONALISA INC DBA

FAIRWAY COLLECTIONS LLC

GLASS DOCTOR DBA

Defendants

ALLIED PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

NATIONWIDE INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SEAN AMORGINOS

Defendant Attorney

JOHN O'FLANAGAN

 

Court Documents

Stipulation

Stipulation; Comments: WAIVING APPEARANCE AT PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE AND INVOKING RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE set for February 15, 2019 at 10:00 AM

Notice of Unavailability

Notice of Unavailability

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

Notice to Appear Scheduled

Notice to Appear Scheduled; Comments: Amended as to non-service

Summons Returned Unserved

Summons Returned Unserved

Amended Complaint

Amended Complaint

Notice to Appear Scheduled

Notice to Appear Scheduled

Letter

Letter; Comments: DATED 12/11/18 FROM AMORGINOS PLLC REGARDING CLAIM

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Statement of Claim

Statement of Claim

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/15/2019
  • HEARING - Pre-Trial Civil - Civil, Pretrial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Stipulation; Comments: WAIVING APPEARANCE AT PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE AND INVOKING RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE set for February 15, 2019 at 10:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Unavailability

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • HEARING - CANCELED-Continued Pre-Trial Civil - Civil, Pretrial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice to Appear Scheduled; Comments: Amended as to non-service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Returned Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Amended Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice to Appear Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Letter; Comments: DATED 12/11/18 FROM AMORGINOS PLLC REGARDING CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Statement of Claim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • Case Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • Description: Payment; Payer: AMORGINOS, SEAN MITCHELL; Amount: -10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • Description: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • Description: Payment; Payer: Sean Amorginos; Amount: -185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • Description: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 185.00

    Read MoreRead Less