This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 03/09/2023 at 05:59:22 (UTC).

JETBLUE AIRWAYS CORPORATION vs. AMY MERCADO AS PROPERTY APPRAISERet al.

Case Summary

On 12/13/2022 JETBLUE AIRWAYS CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against AMY MERCADO AS PROPERTY APPRAISER. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Vincent Falcone. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************98-O

  • Filing Date:

    12/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Vincent Falcone

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JETBLUE AIRWAYS CORPORATION

Defendants

AMY MERCADO AS PROPERTY APPRAISER

SCOTT RANDOLPH AS TAX COLLECTOR

JIM ZINGALE AS EXEC DIRECTOR OF FL DEPT OF REVENUE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MEGAN DELEON

Defendant Attorneys

LOREN LEVY

STEVEN BECHTEL

ALLISON DUDLEY

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Complaint

Complaint

Notice

Notice

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: em atty

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: em atty

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: em atty

Answer

Answer

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Affidavit of Service

Affidavit of Service; Comments: Amy Mercado

Affidavit of Service

Affidavit of Service; Comments: Executive Director of Florida

Affidavit of Service

Affidavit of Service; Comments: Scott Randolph

Answer

Answer

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit of Service; Comments: Scott Randolph

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit of Service; Comments: Executive Director of Florida

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit of Service; Comments: Amy Mercado

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer & Affirmative Defenses

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: em atty

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: em atty

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: em atty

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketService Document Unable to be Issued; Comments: Per Admin Order No. 2021-04, a Standing Case Management Plan, Order for Streamlined or General civil cases must be submitted before summonses can be issued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Akerman LLP; Amount: -430.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 430.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • DocketCase Initiated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less