This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 06/27/2018 at 04:31:20 (UTC).

JAMES K SHEA MD INC vs. GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 05/01/2018 JAMES K SHEA MD INC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is David P Johnson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************07-O

  • Filing Date:

    05/01/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Orange County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

David P Johnson

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JAMES K SHEA MD INC

PHYSICAL MEDICINE PAIN CENTER, P.A. DBA

JUSTIN HARMS AAO

Defendant

GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KEVIN JACKSON

Defendant Attorney

RONALDA STEVENS

 

Court Documents

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: DISCLOSURE, AND DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY E-MAIL ADDRESS

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Notice of Filing

Notice of Filing; Comments: original summons and affidavit of service

Notice to Appear Scheduled

Notice to Appear Scheduled

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Statement of Claim

Statement of Claim

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/15/2018
  • HEARING - Pre-Trial Civil

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: DISCLOSURE, AND DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY E-MAIL ADDRESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Service of Process/Return

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Filing; Comments: original summons and affidavit of service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice to Appear Scheduled

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Statement of Claim

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • Case Initiated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • Description: Payment; Payer: Kevin R Jackson; Amount: -65.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • Description: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 65.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less