This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 06/27/2018 at 04:31:10 (UTC).

JAMES K SHEA MD INC vs. GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 05/01/2018 JAMES K SHEA MD INC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Faye L Allen. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************03-O

  • Filing Date:

    05/01/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Orange County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Faye L Allen

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JAMES K SHEA MD INC

PHYSICAL MEDICINE PAIN CENTER, P.A. DBA

CATALINO ALVAREZ AAO

Defendant

GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KEVIN JACKSON

 

Court Documents

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: DISCLOSURE, AND DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY E-MAIL ADDRESS

Notice to Appear Returned Served

Notice to Appear Returned Served; Comments: geico general insurance company

Notice of Filing

Notice of Filing; Comments: ORIGINAL SUMMONS AND ORIGINAL RETURN OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANT

Notice to Appear Scheduled

Notice to Appear Scheduled; Comments: Amended

Amended Complaint

Amended Complaint

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Statement of Claim

Statement of Claim

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/06/2018
  • HEARING - Pre-Trial Civil

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: DISCLOSURE, AND DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY E-MAIL ADDRESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice to Appear Returned Served; Comments: geico general insurance company

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Filing; Comments: ORIGINAL SUMMONS AND ORIGINAL RETURN OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice to Appear Scheduled; Comments: Amended

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Amended Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Statement of Claim

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • Case Initiated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • Description: Payment; Payer: Kevin R Jackson; Amount: -65.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • Description: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 65.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less