This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 03/09/2019 at 15:41:13 (UTC).

JAGUAR GLASSWORKS PROS LLC vs. NATIONWIDE GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, NATIONWIDE INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA, NATIONWIDE MUTUAL FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY, NATIONWIDE MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, NATIONWIDE PROPERTY CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 01/08/2019 JAGUAR GLASSWORKS PROS LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against NATIONWIDE GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, NATIONWIDE INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA, NATIONWIDE MUTUAL FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY, NATIONWIDE MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, NATIONWIDE PROPERTY CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Evellen H Jewett. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************00-O

  • Filing Date:

    01/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Orange County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Orange County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Evellen H Jewett

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

EXPRESS GLASS SERVICES DBA

KAREN FORD AAO

JAGUAR GLASSWORKS PROS LLC

Defendants

NATIONWIDE MUTUAL FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY

NATIONWIDE MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY

NATIONWIDE GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

NATIONWIDE PROPERTY CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

NATIONWIDE INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SEAN AMORGINOS

Defendant Attorney

JOHN O'FLANAGAN

 

Court Documents

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Order Approving Settlement

Order Approving Settlement; Comments: to drop parties sent to e-rec

Joint Stipulation for Dismissal

Joint Stipulation for Dismissal; Comments: (Dropped)

Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedures

Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedures

Notice of Filing

Notice of Filing; Comments: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

Stipulation

Stipulation; Comments: WAIVING APPEARANCE AT PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE AND INVOKING RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE set for February 15, 2019 at 10:00 AM

Notice of Unavailability

Notice of Unavailability

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice to Appear Scheduled

Notice to Appear Scheduled

Letter

Letter; Comments: Civil Cover Sheet. Complaint. Unissued Summons

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Complaint

Complaint

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Service of Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer & Affirmative Defenses

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Order Approving Settlement and/or Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Order Approving Settlement; Comments: to drop parties sent to e-rec

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Joint Stipulation of Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Joint Stipulation for Dismissal; Comments: (Dropped)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • HEARING - CANCELED-Cancelled Pre-Trial Civil - Civil, Pretrial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedures

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Stipulation; Comments: WAIVING APPEARANCE AT PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE AND INVOKING RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE set for February 15, 2019 at 10:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Unavailability

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice Appearance of Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice to Appear Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Letter; Comments: Civil Cover Sheet. Complaint. Unissued Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • Case Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • Description: Payment; Payer: Sean Amorginos; Amount: -185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • Description: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 185.00

    Read MoreRead Less