This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 08/11/2021 at 16:11:14 (UTC).

JACKSON PARK 2 CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION INC vs. PULTE HOLDINGS INC et al.

Case Summary

On 11/16/2020 JACKSON PARK 2 CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION INC filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against PULTE HOLDINGS INC. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is John E Jordan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************36-O

  • Filing Date:

    11/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

John E Jordan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JACKSON PARK 2 CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION INC

Defendants, Others and 3Rd Party Plaintiffs

TRADEWINDS GROUP OF CENTRAL FL INC

PULTEGROUP INC

AB DESIGN GROUP LLC

BATTERBEE ROOFING INC

PETERSENDEAN ROOFING AND SOLAR SYSTEMS INC

CENTEX HOMES

A AND B STUCCO INC

RUSSO AND SONS LLC

SEVAN PLASTERING INC

MASCHMEYER CONCRETE COMPANY OF FLORIDA

PULTE HOME COMPANY LLC

C STERLING QUALITY ROOFING INC

GB PAINTING DBA

PROFESSIONAL SUNSHINE ROOFING INC

JAX APEX TECHONOLOGY INC

PROBUILD COMPANY LLC

AB DESIGN GROUP INC

VISIONAIRE WINDOWS LLC

PULTE HOLDINGS INC

28 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JOHN WINDLE

Defendant, Other and 3Rd Party Plaintiff Attorneys

BETH-ANN SCHULMAN

MAUREEN ROGERS

SETH ALHADEFF

JOSEF HESS

SHARNICE PERRY

AMANDA ROM

DOUGLAS WALL

ELIZABETH DROZ-STOLINAS

CHRISTOPHER BURROWS

CHRISTINA GIERKE

JAMES HELF

ABBY GOLDMAN

RYAN KNIGHT

MAURA MCCAFFERTY

Other Attorneys

COLE COPERTINO

JAMES MOORHEAD

 

Court Documents

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Answer & Affirmative Defenses; Comments: AMENDED; TO DEFENDANTS/CROSS-PLAINTIFFS , PULTE HOME COMPANY, LLC; PULTEGROUP, INC. AND CENTEX HOMES, SECOND AMENDED CROSSCLAIM AND MOTION TO DISMISS COUNT 18

Cross Claim

Cross Claim; Comments: SECOND AMENDED CROSSCLAIM

Notice of Filing

Notice of Filing; Comments: SECOND AMENDED CROSSCLAIM

Affidavit of Diligent Search and Inquiry

Affidavit of Diligent Search and Inquiry; Comments: IN SUPPORT OF SUBSTITUTE SERVICE OF THIRD PARTY DEFENDANT LEGENDS PAINTING SERVICE LLC

Notice of Filing

Notice of Filing; Comments: AFFIDAVIT

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Answer & Affirmative Defenses; Comments: TO DEFENDANTS/CROSSCLAIM PLAINTIFFS, PULTE HOME COMPANY, LLC S, PULTEGROUP, INC. S, AND CENTEX HOMES CORRECTED AMENDED CROSSCLAIM

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: AND ELECTRONIC SERVICE DESIGNATION

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: AND ELECTRONIC SERVICE DESIGNATION

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: TO EFFECT SERVICE OF PROCESS ON CROSS-DEFENDANT LEGENDS PAINTING SERVICE LLC

Letter

Letter

Order Enlargement and Extension of Time

Order Enlargement and Extension of Time

Return of Service of Summons

Return of Service of Summons; Comments: VISIONAIRE WINDOWS, LLC, R.A. JIM R. SLAUGHTER

Return of Service of Summons

Return of Service of Summons; Comments: SEVAN PLASTERING INC., R.A. MARIA EUGENIA ARIAS

Affidavit of Non-Service

Affidavit of Non-Service; Comments: LEGENDS PAINTING SERVICE, LLC, R.A. LEONARD DIAZ

Response to Request to Produce

Response to Request to Produce

Response to Request to Produce

Response to Request to Produce

254 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer & Affirmative Defenses

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer & Affirmative Defenses; Comments: AMENDED; TO DEFENDANTS/CROSS-PLAINTIFFS , PULTE HOME COMPANY, LLC; PULTEGROUP, INC. AND CENTEX HOMES, SECOND AMENDED CROSSCLAIM AND MOTION TO DISMISS COUNT 18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCross Claim; Comments: SECOND AMENDED CROSSCLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing; Comments: SECOND AMENDED CROSSCLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit of Diligent Search and Inquiry; Comments: IN SUPPORT OF SUBSTITUTE SERVICE OF THIRD PARTY DEFENDANT LEGENDS PAINTING SERVICE LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing; Comments: AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer & Affirmative Defenses; Comments: TO DEFENDANTS/CROSSCLAIM PLAINTIFFS, PULTE HOME COMPANY, LLC S, PULTEGROUP, INC. S, AND CENTEX HOMES CORRECTED AMENDED CROSSCLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer & Affirmative Defenses

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: AND ELECTRONIC SERVICE DESIGNATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: AND ELECTRONIC SERVICE DESIGNATION

    Read MoreRead Less
277 More Docket Entries
  • 11/20/2020
  • DocketService Document Unable to be Issued; Comments: Unable to issue Summons. Case was labeled as Business Court. BC Addendum must be filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: WINDLE, JOHN WILTON, Esquire; Amount: -662.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 210.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 442.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: -430.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 430.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where VISIONAIRE WINDOWS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where PROFESSIONAL SUNSHINE ROOFING INC is a litigant