This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 03/07/2023 at 14:09:17 (UTC).

JACKSON, ELANvs.DAVIS AND HARRELL LLC et al.

Case Summary

On 10/29/2022 JACKSON, ELANvs DAVIS AND HARRELL LLC was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Vincent Falcone. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************38-O

  • Filing Date:

    10/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Vincent Falcone

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ELAN JACKSON

Defendants

DAVIS AND HARRELL LLC

DENNIS UNIFORM MFG LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NICHOLAS SEIDULE

Defendant Attorneys

DAVID GORDON

RAFAEL RODRIGUEZ

 

Court Documents

Response to Request to Produce

Response to Request to Produce

Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories; Comments: TO DEFENDANT DAVIS & HARRELL LLC S INTERROGATORIES

Response

Response; Comments: TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

Notice of Taking Deposition(s)

Notice of Taking Deposition(s)

Motion

Motion; Comments: TO PRESERVE EVIDENCE

Motion for Protective Order

Motion for Protective Order

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Amended Notice of Taking Deposition(s)

Amended Notice of Taking Deposition(s)

Notice of Taking Deposition(s)

Notice of Taking Deposition(s)

Notice for Trial

Notice for Trial; Comments: sent to Judge

Notice of Compliance

Notice of Compliance; Comments: WITH REQUEST FOR COPIES

Request for Copies

Request for Copies

Response to Request to Produce

Response to Request to Produce

Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS OPERATIVE COMPLAINT

Request for Copies

Request for Copies

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

28 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse to Request to Produce

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories; Comments: TO DEFENDANT DAVIS & HARRELL LLC S INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse; Comments: TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Taking Deposition(s)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion; Comments: TO PRESERVE EVIDENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Protective Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer & Affirmative Defenses

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmended Notice of Taking Deposition(s)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Taking Deposition(s)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice for Trial; Comments: sent to Judge

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
25 More Docket Entries
  • 11/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit of Service; Comments: DENNIS UNIFORM MFG, LLC- 11/1/22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing; Comments: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: em atty

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: em atty

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: SeiduleLaw; Amount: -420.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 420.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2022
  • DocketCase Initiated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less