Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 03/08/2019 at 15:45:30 (UTC).

INTERVENTIONAL ASSOCIATES LLC vs. GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 01/07/2019 INTERVENTIONAL ASSOCIATES LLC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Faye L Allen. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************82-O

  • Filing Date:

    01/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Orange County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Orange County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Faye L Allen

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

INTERVENTIONAL ASSOCIATES LLC

SHERNETTE ALAMIN AAO

Defendant

GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BOBBY LEAN

Defendant Attorney

MEGAN LINDSEY

 

Court Documents

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF S DISCOVERY

Response to Request for Admissions

Response to Request for Admissions; Comments: PLAINTIFF'S

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Answer & Affirmative Defenses; Comments: TO PLAINTIFF S COMPLAINT

Summary of Proceedings

Summary of Proceedings

Response to Request to Produce

Response to Request to Produce

Response to Request for Admissions

Response to Request for Admissions

Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: DISCLOSURE, AND DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY E-MAIL ADDRESS

Request to Produce

Request to Produce; Comments: FIRST TO PLAINTIFF

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions; Comments: FIRST

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories; Comments: FIRST TO PLAINTIFF

Notice to Appear

Notice to Appear; Comments: emailed to atty

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Interrogatories

Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF S DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Response to Request for Admissions; Comments: PLAINTIFF'S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer & Affirmative Defenses; Comments: TO PLAINTIFF S COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Summary of Proceedings

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • HEARING - Pre-Trial Civil

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Response to Request to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Response to Request for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: DISCLOSURE, AND DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY E-MAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request to Produce; Comments: FIRST TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 01/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Designation of Email Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Service of Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • Case Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • Description: Payment; Payer: Bobby A Lean; Amount: -90.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • Description: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 90.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where INTERVENTIONAL ASSOCIATES OF LAKELAND DBA is a litigant

Latest cases where GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MEGAN LINDSEY