This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 02/09/2019 at 15:39:50 (UTC).

INTEGRATIVE HLTH SOLUTION LLC vs. IMPERIAL FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 12/11/2018 INTEGRATIVE HLTH SOLUTION LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against IMPERIAL FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are David P Johnson and Evellen H Jewett. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************41-O

  • Filing Date:

    12/11/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Orange County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Orange County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

David P Johnson

Evellen H Jewett

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

INTEGRATIVE HLTH SOLUTION LLC

HENRY MONTERO AKA

HENRY MONTERO AAO

Defendant

IMPERIAL FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant and Plaintiff Attorneys

STEVEN JOHNSON

WILLIAM MCFARLANE

 

Court Documents

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Interrogatories

Interrogatories

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Summary of Proceedings

Summary of Proceedings

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notification of Rejection of Confidential Filing Request

Notification of Rejection of Confidential Filing Request

Notice of Filing

Notice of Filing; Comments: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AND ORIGINAL SUMMONS

Notice to Appear Scheduled

Notice to Appear Scheduled

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Confidential Information within Court Filing

Notice of Confidential Information within Court Filing

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Statement of Claim

Statement of Claim

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Designation of Email Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Summary of Proceedings

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • HEARING - Pre-Trial Civil

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice Appearance of Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notification of Rejection of Confidential Filing Request

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Filing; Comments: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AND ORIGINAL SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice to Appear Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Designation of Email Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Confidential Information within Court Filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • Statement of Claim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • Case Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • Description: Payment; Payer: Steven M Johnson; Amount: -310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • Description: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 310.00

    Read MoreRead Less