This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 10/04/2021 at 22:38:10 (UTC).

HYACINTH BYGRAVEvs.LEVEON C PERKINS

Case Summary

On 09/24/2021 HYACINTH BYGRAVEvs LEVEON C PERKINS was filed as a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Amy J Carter. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************39-O

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Amy J Carter

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HYACINTH BYGRAVE

Defendant

LEVEON C PERKINS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PHILIPPE REVAH

 

Court Documents

Affidavit of Service

Affidavit of Service; Comments: POSTED AS TO LEVEON C PERKINS

Petition or Motion to Strike

Petition or Motion to Strike; Comments: DEFENDANT'S ANSWER AND FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION

Answer

Answer; Comments: sent to judge

Summons Issued 5 Day

Summons Issued 5 Day; Comments: EMAILED ATTY

Complaint

Complaint

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit of Service; Comments: POSTED AS TO LEVEON C PERKINS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition or Motion to Strike; Comments: DEFENDANT'S ANSWER AND FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer; Comments: sent to judge

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued 5 Day; Comments: EMAILED ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: REVAH, PHILIPPE; Amount: -195.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 195.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer REVAH, PHILIPPE