This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 05/05/2023 at 15:38:08 (UTC).

HUTCHINSON, BETTYvs.IKEA US RETAIL LLC et al.

Case Summary

On 03/06/2023 HUTCHINSON, BETTYvs IKEA US RETAIL LLC was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is A James Craner. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************98-O

  • Filing Date:

    03/06/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

A James Craner

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BETTY HUTCHINSON

Defendants

IKEA US RETAIL LLC

ECOBRITE SERVICES LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JOE MITCHELL

Defendant Attorneys

GERARD TUZZIO

MADDGE PENTON

 

Court Documents

Response to Request for Admissions

Response to Request for Admissions

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

Petition or Motion to Strike

Petition or Motion to Strike; Comments: DEFENDANT'S AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND PLAINTIFF'S REPLY TO AFFIRAMTIVE DEFENSES

Request for Copies

Request for Copies

Response to Request to Produce

Response to Request to Produce

Request for Copies

Request for Copies

Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

Notice of Production of Non-Party

Notice of Production of Non-Party

Complaint

Complaint

Case Management Plan/Order - General Track

Case Management Plan/Order - General Track; Comments: Proposed - Unsigned

Agreed Upon Case Management Plan

Agreed Upon Case Management Plan

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories; Comments: on def, Ecobrite Servicesa, LLC

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories; Comments: On def Ikean US Retail, LLC

Correspondence

Correspondence; Comments: case history

Notice of Transfer

Notice of Transfer

Receipt of Transfer

Receipt of Transfer

Copy or Copies

Copy or Copies; Comments: certified copy of Order to Transfer

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse to Request for Admissions

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition or Motion to Strike; Comments: DEFENDANT'S AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND PLAINTIFF'S REPLY TO AFFIRAMTIVE DEFENSES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Copies

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse to Request to Produce

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Copies

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Production of Non-Party

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 03/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Plan/Order - General Track; Comments: Proposed - Unsigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAgreed Upon Case Management Plan

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories; Comments: on def, Ecobrite Servicesa, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories; Comments: On def Ikean US Retail, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCorrespondence; Comments: case history

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Transfer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReceipt of Transfer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCopy or Copies; Comments: certified copy of Order to Transfer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • DocketCase Initiated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less