This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 03/03/2019 at 15:31:55 (UTC).

HUMPHRIES, ANGELA vs. GRAHAM ROHLF, PATRICKet al.

Case Summary

On 01/02/2019 HUMPHRIES, ANGELA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against GRAHAM ROHLF, PATRICK. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Lisa T Munyon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************33-O

  • Filing Date:

    01/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Orange County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Orange County Circuit Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Lisa T Munyon

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ANGELA HUMPHRIES

Defendants

PATRICK GRAHAM ROHLF

EMILY ROHLF

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STEVEN TOMESKO

 

Court Documents

Summons Returned Served

Summons Returned Served; Comments: Patrick Graham Rohlf

Summons Returned Served

Summons Returned Served; Comments: Emily Rohlf

Receipt of Transfer

Receipt of Transfer

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: E Mail Attorney

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: E Mail Attorney

Complaint

Complaint

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Returned Served; Comments: Patrick Graham Rohlf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Returned Served; Comments: Emily Rohlf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Receipt of Transfer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: E Mail Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: E Mail Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Service of Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Service of Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • Case Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • Description: Payment; Payer: Dan Newlin & Partners; Amount: -420.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • Description: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 420.00

    Read MoreRead Less