This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 07/09/2022 at 15:41:21 (UTC).

HOWARD, BRENTLY vs. VEGA, DIANAet al.

Case Summary

On 05/10/2022 HOWARD, BRENTLY filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against VEGA, DIANA. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Vincent Falcone. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************30-O

  • Filing Date:

    05/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Vincent Falcone

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BRENTLY HOWARD

Defendants

DIANA VEGA

MARK OATSVALL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHRISTINA ARGUELLES

Defendant Attorney

AYDA KAPSALES

 

Court Documents

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Response to Request for Admissions

Response to Request for Admissions

Response to Request for Admissions

Response to Request for Admissions

Summons Returned Served

Summons Returned Served; Comments: Mark Oatsvall

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories; Comments: TO DEFENDANT, MARK OATSVALL

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Request to Produce

Request to Produce; Comments: TO DEFENDANT, MARK OATSVALL

Request to Produce

Request to Produce; Comments: TO DEFENDANT, DIANA VEGA

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions; Comments: TO DEFENDANT, MARK OATSVALL

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions; Comments: TO DEFENDANT, DIANA VEGA

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Complaint

Complaint

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer & Affirmative Defenses

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse to Request for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse to Request for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Returned Served; Comments: Mark Oatsvall

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Returned Served; Comments: Diana Vega

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories; Comments: TO DEFENDANT, MARK OATSVALL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce; Comments: TO DEFENDANT, MARK OATSVALL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce; Comments: TO DEFENDANT, DIANA VEGA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions; Comments: TO DEFENDANT, MARK OATSVALL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions; Comments: TO DEFENDANT, DIANA VEGA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Designation of Email Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer AYDA KAPSALES