This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 08/09/2019 at 15:35:47 (UTC).

HOSKINSON, TONIvs.UNIVERSAL CITY DEVELOPMENT PARKS PARTNERS LTD

Case Summary

On 06/10/2019 HOSKINSON, TONIvs UNIVERSAL CITY DEVELOPMENT PARKS PARTNERS LTD was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Keith A Carsten. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************84-O

  • Filing Date:

    06/10/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Keith A Carsten

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TONI HOSKINSON

Defendants

UNIVERSAL PARKS AND RESORTS MANAGEMENT SERVICES

UNIVERSAL CITY DEVELOPMENT PARKS PARTNERS LTD

VOLCANO BAY DBA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DANIEL IRACKI

Defendant Attorney

MICHAEL TYSON

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Complaint

Complaint

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EMAILED TO ATTY.

Amended Complaint

Amended Complaint; Comments: AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Answer & Affirmative Defenses; Comments: DEFENDANT S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFF S AMENDED COMPLAINT

Notice of Taking Deposition(s)

Notice of Taking Deposition(s); Comments: TONI HOSKINSON FRIDAY, OCTOBER 11, 2019 @ 11:00 a.m.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Taking Deposition(s); Comments: TONI HOSKINSON FRIDAY, OCTOBER 11, 2019 @ 11:00 a.m.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • Service Document Unable to be Issued; Comments: no fee provided

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer & Affirmative Defenses; Comments: DEFENDANT S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFF S AMENDED COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Service of Interrogatories

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Service of Interrogatories

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request to Produce

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Designation of Email Address

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • Service Document Unable to be Issued; Comments: summons not issued - no fee provided for the amended summons

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Amended Complaint; Comments: AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EMAILED TO ATTY.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • Case Initiated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • Description: Payment; Payer: Howard C Coker; Amount: -410.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • Description: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 410.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where UNIVERSAL PARKS & RESORTS is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MICHAEL TYSON