Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 02/12/2021 at 16:29:52 (UTC).

HILL ORTHOPEDIC CENTER LLCvs.FIRST ACCEPTANCE INSURANCE COMPANY INC

Case Summary

On 02/21/2020 HILL ORTHOPEDIC CENTER LLCvs FIRST ACCEPTANCE INSURANCE COMPANY INC was filed as a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Gisela T Laurent and Carly S Wish. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************51-O

  • Filing Date:

    02/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Orange County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Orange County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Gisela T Laurent

Carly S Wish

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ANTHONY GANDY AAO

HILL ORTHOPEDIC CENTER LLC

Defendant

FIRST ACCEPTANCE INSURANCE COMPANY INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GREGORY GUDIN

Defendant Attorney

ERIC TOURIAN

 

Court Documents

Voluntary Dismissal

Voluntary Dismissal

Notice of Service of Proposal for Settlement

Notice of Service of Proposal for Settlement

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Answer & Affirmative Defenses; Comments: (AMENDED) AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRAIL

Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

Privilege Log

Privilege Log

Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

Response to Request to Produce

Response to Request to Produce

Response to Request for Admissions

Response to Request for Admissions

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address; Comments: PURSUANT TO FLA. JUD. ADMIN. 2.516

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Notice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: FIRST ACCEPTANCE INSURANCE COMPANY INC

Statement of Claim

Statement of Claim

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVoluntary Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVoluntary Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Summary Judgment; Comments: RE: DEFECTIVE PRESUIT DEMAND LETTER - Defendant, FIRST ACCEPTANCE INSURANCE COMPANY, INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Proposal for Settlement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer & Affirmative Defenses; Comments: (AMENDED) AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Change; Comments: of Counsel of Record and Amended Compliance with Rule 2.516 and Designation of Email Adresses

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPrivilege Log

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse to Request to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 04/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • HearingHearing: Pre-Trial Civil; Location: Room 130.02 on the 1st Floor Pre-Trial Mediation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • DocketHEARING - Pre-Trial Civil

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: FIRST ACCEPTANCE INSURANCE COMPANY INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice to Appear Scheduled; Comments: emailed atty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Marc Salpeter; Amount: -310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Claim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HILL ORTHOPEDIC CENTER LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where First Acceptance Insurance Company Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ERIC TOURIAN